List of chief minister of uttarakhand
Web16 jan. 2024 · Who is the Chief Minister of Uttarakhand? Pushkar Singh Dhami is the current Chief Minister of Uttarakhand Who is the education minister in Uttarakhand? … Web7 jul. 2024 · Check the complete list of ministers below: Pushkar Singh Dhami, Chief Minister: Home, Finance, state estate, revenue, justice, technical education, civil aviation, information, planning,...
List of chief minister of uttarakhand
Did you know?
WebIn the Republic of India, a chief minister is the head of government of each of the twenty-eight states and three of the eight union territories.According to the Constitution of India, at the state-level, the governor is de jure … WebVipin Sanghi is the current Chief Justice of the Uttarakhand High Court. He assumed office on 28 June 2024. [1] Contents List of the Chief Justices of Uttarakhand See also References External links List of the Chief Justices of Uttarakhand Following is the list of the Chief Justices of Uttarakhand since its inception on 9 November 2000: Colour key
Web9 mrt. 2024 · Candidates for Uttarakhand CM post (L-R) Rajya Sabha MP Anil Baluni, Maharashtra Governor Bhagat Singh Koshyari, Union Education Minister Ramesh Pokhriyal, Uttarakhand Minister Dhan Singh Rawat In Short Trivendra Singh Rawat resigned after meeting BJP national leadership on Tuesday Web2 jul. 2024 · The current Chief Minister of Uttarakhand is Tirath Singh Rawat, who has been in this post since 10 March 2024. Nityanand Swami was the first Chief Minister of …
WebSr.No Name Constituency Department Party; 1: Satpal Maharaj: Chaubattakhal: Irrigation: India-Nepal-Uttarakhand River Projects: BJP : Flood Control: Tourism Minor Irrigation Web23 mrt. 2024 · Latest Update: Pushkar Singh Dhami is the new Chief Minister of Uttarakhand for the second term as well. His name has been finalised in the BJP …
Web29 nov. 2024 · Mr. Chief Minister (informal) Status: Head of government: Abbreviation: CM: Member of: Uttarakhand Council of Ministers; Uttarakhand Legislative Assembly; …
Web3 apr. 2024 · On 29th March 8 Ministers and Pushkar Singh Dhammi took an oath. Chief Minister Pushkar Singh Dhammi retained the Home Ministry, Satpal Maharaj was … daco hand controllers incWebThe longest-serving Deputy Chief Minister of India was Sushil Kumar Modi who served as Deputy Chief Minister of Bihar from Bharatiya Janata Party. As of 28 March 2024, two Indian states ( Chhattisgarh, Uttarakhand) and one union territory ( Puducherry) never had a deputy chief minister and any woman now not serving as deputy chief minister. da collins automated phone callsWebThe chief minister of Uttarakhand is the chief executive of the Indian state of Uttarakhand. In accordance with the Constitution of India, the governor is a state's de jure head, but de facto executive authority rests with the chief minister. Following elections to the legislative assembly, the state's governor usually invites the party (or coalition) with a … binn consultancyWebThe Chief Minister of Uttarakhand is the Head of government of the India state of Uttarakhand.In accordance with the Constitution of India, the Governors of states of … binned entropy pythonWeb12 apr. 2024 · Welcome to Uttarakhand. Uttarakhand was formed on 9th November 2000 as the 27th State of India, ... Chief Minister Shri Pushkar Singh Dhami. Hon'ble Ministers. MP(LS) MP(RS) Courtesy - Uttarakhand Vidhan Sabha . Uttarakhand at a Glance. Area:53,483 sq.km. Population: 100.86 lakh binned offWeb1 dag geleden · The other four CMs in the list of top 10 richest chief ministers include Nagaland CM Neiphui Rio with total assets worth Rs 46.95, followed by Assam Chief Minister Himanta Biswa Sarma with Rs 17. ... da-com corporation of columbia llc reviewsWeb18 jan. 2024 · List of Chief Ministers of Uttarakhand (2000-2024) Check below the list of all CM of Uttarakhand for the period 2000-2024: SL. No: Name of CM: Period : Party : 1. … dac non linearity